CO SB287 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-4)
Status: Passed on May 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-4)
Status: Passed on May 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the financing of public schools, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Public School Finance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-287 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 23-287 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-287, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.040 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.039 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.038 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.032 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.031 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.030 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 23-287, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.028 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.026 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.024 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.022 (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.021 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.019 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.018 (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.016 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.015 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-287 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 23-287 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-287, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.040 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.039 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.038 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.032 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.031 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.030 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 23-287, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.028 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.026 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.024 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.022 (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.021 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.019 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.018 (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.016 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.015 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-15 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-08 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-28 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-27 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2023-04-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |