CO SB280 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning extending the repeal date of the Colorado economic development commission, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Extending The Economic Development Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-280 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 17-280 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-280, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-280 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-280 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 17-280 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-280, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-280 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-20 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-05 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-05 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-05-02 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-04-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |