CO SB279 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning delinquent interest payments for property tax payments.
Title
Delinquent Interest Payments Property Tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-279 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-279 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-279 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-279 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-04 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-06-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-06-01 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |