CO SB278 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - Senate Second Reading Lost with Amendments - Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - Senate Second Reading Lost with Amendments - Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning increasing the penalty for assault on certain first responders.
Title
Increase Penalty For First Responder Assaults
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-278, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.001 [Attachment A]. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-278, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-278, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.001 [Attachment A]. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-278, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Lost with Amendments - Committee |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |