CO SB278 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a prohibition against engaging in a nuisance exhibition of motor vehicle exhaust.
Title
Prohibit Nuisance Exhibition Motor Vehicle Exhaust
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 17-278 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Refer Senate Bill 17-278 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 17-278 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Refer Senate Bill 17-278 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-27 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |