CO SB276 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning methods to alleviate the fiscal impact of state regulations on small businesses, and, in connection therewith, enacting the 'Regulatory Relief Act of 2017'.
Title
Alleviate Fiscal Impact State Rules Small Business
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 17-276 to the Committee on Business Affairs and Labor. (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 17-276 indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 17-276 indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-276 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 17-276 indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 17-276 indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-276 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-04-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |