CO SB273 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over with Amendments to 05/11/2017 - Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over with Amendments to 05/11/2017 - Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the manufacturer's list price of tobacco products for purposes of the state excise tax.
Title
Manufacturer's List Price For Tobacco Products Tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-273, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-273 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-273, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-273 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over with Amendments to 05/11/2017 - Committee |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |