CO SB269 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Electronic Device Recycling
Title
Electronic Device Recycling
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Kerr [D] | Sen. Gail Schwartz [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone Senate Bill 11- 269 indefinitely (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone Senate Bill 11- 269 indefinitely (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone Senate Bill 11- 269 indefinitely (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-269, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-269, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-269, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-269, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-269 to the Committee on Finance, as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-269 to the Committee on Finance, as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-269 to the Committee on Finance, as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone Senate Bill 11- 269 indefinitely (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone Senate Bill 11- 269 indefinitely (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-269, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-269, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-269, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-269, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-269 to the Committee on Finance, as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-269 to the Committee on Finance, as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-269 to the Committee on Finance, as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Postpone Indefinitely | |
2011-05-10 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-10 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources | |
2011-05-09 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-05-09 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-05-06 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2011-05-05 | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy Refer Amended to Finance | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2011-04-29 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy + Finance + Appropriations |