CO SB264 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the ability of certain alcohol beverage license holders to participate in festivals for alcohol beverage retail activity.
Title
Alcohol Beverage Festival Participation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-264 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 23-264 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.009) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 23-264, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-264 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 23-264 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.009) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 23-264, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-17 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-05 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-26 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-24 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2023-04-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |