CO SB261 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oral Health Community Programs
Title
Oral Health Community Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-261 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-261 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-261 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-261 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-261 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-261 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-261 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-30 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance & Environment |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |