CO SB258 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of open educational resources in public institutions of higher education, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Using Open Educational Resources In Higher Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-21 - House - (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Joint - CC_2017A: Adopt amendment that first committee report of the first conference committee on SB 258 was adopted. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Motion Adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-258 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-258 to the Committee of the Whole and consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Joint - CC_2017A: Adopt amendment that first committee report of the first conference committee on SB 258 was adopted. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Motion Adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-258 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-258 to the Committee of the Whole and consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2017-04-19 | House | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2017-04-18 | First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Reengrossed w/ Amendments | |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-06 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Floor |
2017-04-06 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-04-04 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-31 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |