CO SB257 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning an exemption from motor vehicle registration requirements for certain special mobile machinery.
Title
Special Mobile Machinery Registration Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-257 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-257 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-257 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-257 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-257 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-257 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-257 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-257 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-04 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-27 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-05-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |