CO SB254 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Renewable Energy Std New Solar Extend Date
Title
Renewable Energy Std New Solar Extend Date
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Grantham [R] | Sen. Pete Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-254 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-254 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-254 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-254 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-254 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-30 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-30 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |