CO SB252 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the timing of joint committee of reference hearings under the "State Measurement for Accountable, Responsive, and Transparent (SMART) Government Act", and, in connection therewith, reducing an appropriation.
Title
State Measurement for Accountable, Responsive, and Transparent (SMART) Government Act Committee Hearings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.001) (Y: 28 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-252 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-252, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.001) (Y: 28 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-252 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-252, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-27 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |