CO SB246 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning measures to encourage beneficial electrification, and, in connection therewith, directing the public utilities commission and Colorado utilities to promote compliance with current environmental and labor standards and making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric Utility Promote Beneficial Electrification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-246, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-246, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 21-246 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 21-246 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-246 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 21-246, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment G) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment F) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment E) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 21-246, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-21 Governor Signed
2021-06-15 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-15SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-08SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-06-07HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-04HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-06-04HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-05-27HouseHouse Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-05-12HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment
2021-05-12SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-11SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2021-05-07SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-04-29SenateSenate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-04-16SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb21-246
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_246_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_246_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_246_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_246_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_246_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_246_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB246_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB246_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB246_L.003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB246_L.004.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB246_L.005.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB246_L.006.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB246_L.009.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB246_L.010.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB246_J.002.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb246_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb246_r2.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0246_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0246_hse.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/36c0d3fc19f8c3e7872586c60057b7a2-sb21-246-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2a9750224fb4964a872586ce0052ba48-sb21-246-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-246vote5678ce
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/36c0d3fc19f8c3e7872586c60057b7a2-sb21-246-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/36c0d3fc19f8c3e7872586c60057b7a2-sb21-246-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/36c0d3fc19f8c3e7872586c60057b7a2-sb21-246-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/36c0d3fc19f8c3e7872586c60057b7a2-sb21-246-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/36c0d3fc19f8c3e7872586c60057b7a2-sb21-246-5-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/36c0d3fc19f8c3e7872586c60057b7a2-sb21-246-6-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9fce32ba9da05eb8872586e2007d3982-sb21-246-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9673bcad4d15ca33872586ea0057d427-sb21-246-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9673bcad4d15ca33872586ea0057d427-sb21-246-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-246vote14c70e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-246vote636bed
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-246vote637e30
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9fce32ba9da05eb8872586e2007d3982-sb21-246-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments 750

feedback