CO SB244 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - House Committee on Health and Environment Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - House Committee on Health and Environment Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal Crimes Marital Status Element
Title
Repeal Crimes Marital Status Element
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone Senate Bill 11-244 indefinitely (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone Senate Bill 11-244 indefinitely (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone Senate Bill 11-244 indefinitely (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-244 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-244 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-244 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone Senate Bill 11-244 indefinitely (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone Senate Bill 11-244 indefinitely (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-244 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-244 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-244 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | House Committee on Health and Environment Postpone Indefinitely | |
2011-05-05 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health and Environment | |
2011-05-02 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-29 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2011-04-28 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-26 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-04-20 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |