CO SB240 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the regulation of commercial products containing industrial hemp.
Title
Industrial Hemp Products Regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer Senate Bill 19-240 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 19-240, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 19-240, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer Senate Bill 19-240 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 19-240, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 19-240, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | House | House Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |