CO SB237 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning amending the "Colorado Consumer Protection Act" to clarify the damages for which plaintiffs are eligible.
Title
Consumer Protection Act Damages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - House Finance: Postpone Senate Bill 19-237 indefinitely. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-237 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-237 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely |
2019-05-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |