CO SB237 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
General Fund Reserve Increase
Title
General Fund Reserve Increase
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-237 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-237 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-237 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-237 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-237 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-237 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-237 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-04-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-04 | House | House Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |