CO SB232 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-4)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning an appropriation to the department of higher education for the Colorado opportunity scholarship initiative's displaced workers grant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Displaced Workers Grant

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-232, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-232, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-232 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-232 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-232 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24 Governor Signed
2021-06-15 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-08SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-06-07HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-04HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2021-06-04HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-05-19HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-05-05HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education
2021-05-03SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-30SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-30SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-04-14SenateSenate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-03-31SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Education

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb21-232
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_232_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_232_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_232_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_232_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_232_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_232_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB232_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB232_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB232_L.004.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb232_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0232_hse.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b2ac3de6a6290284872586b70057fed6-sb21-232-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4fa74329f24d420e872586c7005010c9-sb21-232-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-232vote5b4808
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6a636d8b9c92c946872586da0072d0e6-sb21-232-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/34cd03a9c3671f06872586ea005776e5-sb21-232-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/34cd03a9c3671f06872586ea005776e5-sb21-232-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/34cd03a9c3671f06872586ea005776e5-sb21-232-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-232vote0c90ba
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-232vote631b02
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-232vote632f03

Bill Comments 750

feedback