CO SB230 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the Colorado refugee services program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Colorado Refugee Services Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-230 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-230 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28 Governor Signed
2019-05-07 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-07HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-07SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-24HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-23HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-22HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-18HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-12HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2019-04-12SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-11SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-08SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-02SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-230
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_230_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_230_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_230_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_230_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_230_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_230_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/38291e25a8673c5e872583d6006b552e-sb19-230-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-230vote56bb3c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9db7461f9b641b67872583e00081ce1b-sb19-230-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-230vote626a17

Bill Comments

feedback