CO SB223 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the requirement that businesses licensed to sell motor vehicles have a principal place of business.
Title
Motor Vehicle Dealer Principal Place Of Business
Sponsors
Sen. Nick Hinrichsen [D] | Rep. Mandy Lindsay [D] | Rep. Marc Snyder [D] | Sen. Dominick Moreno [D] |
Rep. Shannon Bird [D] | Rep. Edith Hooton [D] | Rep. Andres Pico [R] | Rep. Shane Sandridge [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 22-223 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 22-223 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 22-223 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 22-223 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-07 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-04 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-05-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-02 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |