CO SB218 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-3)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-3)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning revenue allocated to the employment and training technology fund in the division of unemployment insurance in the department of labor and employment.
Title
Colorado Department Of Labor And Employment Employment And Training Technology Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-218 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-218, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-218, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-218 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-218, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-218, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-16 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-04-15 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-14 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-04-13 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |