CO SB218 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Disclose Misrepresentations By Peace Officers
Title
Disclose Misrepresentations By Peace Officers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-218 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-218, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-218, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Pass |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Reconsider |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2015-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-23 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2015-04-21 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |