CO SB216 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning continuation of the regulation of collection agencies under the 'Colorado Fair Debt Collection Practices Act', and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations of the 2016 sunset report of the department of regulatory agencies and making an appropriation.
Title
Sunset Continue Fair Debt Collections Act
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Gardner [R] | Rep. Susan Lontine [D] | Rep. KC Becker [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-216, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-216, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-216, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-216, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-216, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-216, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-216, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-216, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-216, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-216, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-216, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-216, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-05-02 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-26 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-04-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |