CO SB213 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-3)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-3)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning continuing support for necessary child care programs, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Child Care Support Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-213, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 22-213, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment F). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 22-213, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-213, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 22-213, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 22-213, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-213, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 22-213, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment F). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 22-213, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-213, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 22-213, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment D). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 22-213, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-05-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-05-05 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-05-04 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-03 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-04-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |