CO SB213 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the increased money received due to the federal "Families First Coronavirus Response Act", and, in connection therewith, making and reducing appropriations.
Title
Use Of Increased Medicaid Match
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-213 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-213 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-213 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-213 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-16 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-04-15 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-14 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-04-13 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |