CO SB213 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning requiring local school districts to recognize academic credits earned by students in the custody of the division of youth services.
Title
Transfer Academic Credits For Division Of Youth Services Youths
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 18-213 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 18-213 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 18-213 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 18-213 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-02 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |