CO SB212 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clean-up Bail Bond Statutes
Title
Clean-up Bail Bond Statutes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-212 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-212, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-212, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2014-05-01 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-05-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |