CO SB211 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-9)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning adopting federal regulations to the "Indian Child Welfare Act of 1978" as state law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal Indian Child Welfare Act Of 1978

Sponsors

Sen. Jessie Danielson [D]Sen. Dominick Moreno [D]Rep. Barbara McLachlan [D]Rep. Elizabeth Velasco [D]
Sen. Mark Baisley [R]Sen. Janet Buckner [D]Sen. James Coleman [D]Sen. Lisa Cutter [D]
Sen. Thomas Exum [D]Sen. Steve Fenberg [D]Sen. Joann Ginal [D]Sen. Julie Gonzales [D]
Sen. Sonya Jaquez Lewis [D]Sen. Chris Kolker [D]Sen. Janice Marchman [D]Sen. Kyle Mullica [D]
Sen. Kevin Priola [D]Sen. Dylan Roberts [D]Sen. Cleave Simpson [R]Sen. Tom Sullivan [D]
Sen. Perry Will [R]Sen. Faith Winter [D]Rep. Judith Amabile [D]Rep. Jennifer Bacon [D]
Rep. Shannon Bird [D]Rep. Andrew Boesenecker [D]Rep. Kyle Brown [D]Rep. Monica Duran [D]
Rep. Regina English [D]Rep. Lisa Frizell [R]Rep. Meg Froelich [D]Rep. Lorena Garcia [D]
Rep. Serena Gonzales-Gutierrez [D]Rep. Eliza Hamrick [D]Rep. Leslie Herod [D]Rep. Iman Jodeh [D]
Rep. Cathy Kipp [D]Rep. Sheila Lieder [D]Rep. Mandy Lindsay [D]Rep. Meghan Lukens [D]
Rep. Michael Lynch [R]Rep. Javier Mabrey [D]Rep. Bob Marshall [D]Rep. Matthew Martinez [D]
Rep. Tisha Mauro [D]Rep. Julie McCluskie [D]Sen. Dafna Michaelson Jenet [D]Rep. David Ortiz [D]
Rep. Jennifer Parenti [D]Rep. Rose Pugliese [R]Rep. Naquetta Ricks [D]Rep. Said Sharbini [D]
Rep. Emily Sirota [D]Rep. Marc Snyder [D]Rep. Matt Soper [R]Rep. Tammy Story [D]
Rep. Rick Taggart [R]Rep. Brianna Titone [D]Rep. Alex Valdez [D]Rep. Stephanie Vigil [D]
Rep. Ron Weinberg [R]Rep. Michael Weissman [D]Rep. Jenny Willford [D]Rep. Steven Woodrow [D]
Rep. Mary Young [D]

Roll Calls

2023-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 23-211 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 23-211, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 23-211, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-04 Governor Signed
2023-05-03 Sent to the Governor
2023-05-03HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2023-05-03SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2023-04-26HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-04-25HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2023-04-24HouseHouse Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2023-04-18HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
2023-04-18SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2023-04-17SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2023-04-13SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2023-03-22SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb23-211
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_211_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_211_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_211_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_211_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_211_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/2023a_211_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2023A/amendments/D6B2E3A76D58ED308725898F007365A1/SB211_L.001.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb211_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2023A/bills/fn/2023a_sb211_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/89aefaad16fccb5a872589910001efed-sb23-211-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb23-211vote5577e1
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/be8964637ad5f2008725899b0073fe27-sb23-211-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb23-211vote57c976
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/89aefaad16fccb5a872589910001efed-sb23-211-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback