CO SB207 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Hearing: May 1 in Room Old State Library
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Hearing: May 1 in Room Old State Library
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning access to distributed energy, and, in connection therewith, establishing requirements for the development of inclusive community solar capacity that investor-owned electric utilities must make available to utility customers, requiring the acquisition of distributed generation facilities paired with energy storage, and making an appropriation.
Title
Access to Distributed Generation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-207, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-207, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 24-207, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 24-207, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-207, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-207, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 24-207, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 24-207, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Finance |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |