CO SB206 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mortgage Loan Licensing Exemptions
Title
Mortgage Loan Licensing Exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-206, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-206, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-206, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-206 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-206 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-206 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-206, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-206, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-206 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-206 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-206 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-05-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-17 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-10 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2011-05-10 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-09 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-29 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-26 | House Committee on Economic and Business Development Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-04-18 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Economic and Business Development | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-04 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-03-25 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health and Human Services |