CO SB206 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-05 - House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-05 - House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Distrib Of State Share Of Ltd Gaming Rev
Title
Distrib Of State Share Of Ltd Gaming Rev
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone Senate Bill 10-206 indefinitely (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-206 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-206 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-05 | House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-03 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance | |
2010-04-30 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2010-04-30 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2010-04-28 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |