CO SB205 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans Fire Corps For Wildland Firefighting
Title
Veterans Fire Corps For Wildland Firefighting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-205 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-205, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-205, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-205 to the Committee of the Whole. Consent calendar The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-205 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-205, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-205, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-205 to the Committee of the Whole. Consent calendar The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-205 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2015-04-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-04-29 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-22 | House | House Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-04-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |