CO SB204 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-16)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning an appropriation to the department of local affairs for the rural economic development initiative grant program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rural Economic Development Initiative Grant Program Funding

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-204 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer Senate Bill 21-204, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer Senate Bill 21-204, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-204, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-204, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 21-204 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15 Governor Signed
2021-06-10 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-10SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-10HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-02SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-06-01HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-28HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-05-28HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-05-17HouseHouse Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-05-07HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water
2021-05-03SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-30SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-04-30SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-04-13SenateSenate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-03-31SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb21-204
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_204_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_204_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_204_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_204_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_204_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_204_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB204_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB204_L.003.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb204_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb204_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0204_hse.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0f44f3030a6382ff872586b6006e41fd-sb21-204-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b6b3ce9e3b9926d5872586c7004fc56c-sb21-204-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-204vote5b47fc
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b6b3ce9e3b9926d5872586c7004fc56c-sb21-204-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4748caa54aa455fb872586d800740003-sb21-204-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cf38d204110bba1f872586e3004ea6d8-sb21-204-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-204vote7c9760
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-204vote58a10c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-204vote58afef
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4748caa54aa455fb872586d800740003-sb21-204-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments 750

feedback