CO SB203 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning payment of expenses of the legislative department.
Title
Fiscal Year 2019-20 Legislative Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-203 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-203 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-203 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-203 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Governor Signed | |
2019-04-04 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-02 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |