CO SB200 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
Pending: House Committee of the Whole Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
Pending: House Committee of the Whole Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning ways to address equity, diversity, and inclusion disparities in Colorado's child welfare system.
Title
Equity, Diversity, & Inclusion in Child Welfare
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 24-200, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 24-200, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 24-200, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |