CO SB194 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning special districts that provide emergency services, and, in connection therewith, authorizing a district to impose an impact fee on certain new construction and to levy a sales tax to generate additional revenue for district services.
Title
Special District Emergency Services Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 24-194 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer Senate Bill 24-194, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer Senate Bill 24-194, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 24-194 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer Senate Bill 24-194, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer Senate Bill 24-194, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-23 | House | House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/17/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government & Housing Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government & Housing |