CO SB193 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-8)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
Pending: House State, Civic, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
Hearing: May 2 in Room LSB-A
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
Pending: House State, Civic, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
Hearing: May 2 in Room LSB-A
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a requirement that any annexation of lands within the exterior boundaries of a reservation of a federally recognized Indian tribe be approved by the tribal council of the Indian tribe.
Title
Protect Tribal Lands from Unauthorized Annexation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 24-193 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 24-193 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/25/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/24/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/23/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |