CO SB191 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Work Comp Procedures Settlements Lump Sum Per Diem
Title
Work Comp Procedures Settlements Lump Sum Per Diem
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-191 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-191 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-191, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-191 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-191, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-31 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2014-05-01 | House | House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |