CO SB188 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-5)
Status: Passed on May 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-5)
Status: Passed on May 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the financing of public schools, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Public School Finance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-188 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 24-188 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-188, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 24-188, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-188 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 24-188 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-188, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 24-188, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-23 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-24 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-17 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-04-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |