CO SB187 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning commissions on judicial performance.
Title
Commissions On Judicial Performance
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Lee [D] | Sen. Bob Gardner [R] | Rep. Shannon Bird [D] | Rep. Hugh McKean [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-187 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-187, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-187, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-187 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-187, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-187, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-24 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-23 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-22 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-18 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |