CO SB186 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the expansion of agricultural chemical management plans to protect surface water, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Expand Agricultural Chemical Management Program Protect Surface Water
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-186 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-186 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer Senate Bill 19-186 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-186, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-186, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-186, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 19-186 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 19-186 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-186 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-186 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer Senate Bill 19-186 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-186, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-186, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-186, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 19-186 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 19-186 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-03 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-30 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-30 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-29 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-26 | House | House Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Unamended to Finance |
2019-04-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Finance |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |