CO SB186 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - House Committee on Appropriations Committee Vote - Final Action Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - House Committee on Appropriations Committee Vote - Final Action Failed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Alternative Bond Program
Title
Alternative Bond Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - SUBSTITUTE MOTION: Refer Senate Bill 11-186 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended, with a favorable recommendation (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - SUBSTITUTE MOTION: Refer Senate Bill 11-186 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended, with a favorable recommendation (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - SUBSTITUTE MOTION: Refer Senate Bill 11-186 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended, with a favorable recommendation (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-186 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-186 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-186 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - SUBSTITUTE MOTION: Refer Senate Bill 11-186 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended, with a favorable recommendation (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - SUBSTITUTE MOTION: Refer Senate Bill 11-186 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended, with a favorable recommendation (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-186 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-186 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-186 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | House Committee on Appropriations Committee Vote - Final Action Failed | |
2011-05-10 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2011-05-09 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-03 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-26 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-21 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2011-03-07 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations |