CO SB184 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Senate Consideration of Second Conference Committee Report result was to Adhere - CCR produced
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning measures to define lawful consumption of marijuana.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Private Marijuana Clubs Open And Public Use

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - CC_2017A: Adopt conference committee report CLSB184.005. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - CC_2017A: Adopt CLSB184.003. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - CC_2017A: Adopt proposed conference committee report CLSB 184.002 (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-10 - CC_2017A: Substitute motion to adopt report CLSB184.004. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: Expand Conference Committee Scope (Y: 33 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Motion Adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-184 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.001. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-184, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.003. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10SenateSenate Consideration of Second Conference Committee Report result was to Adhere - CCR produced
2017-05-10HouseHouse Consideration of Second Conference Committee Report result was to Adhere - CCR produced
2017-05-10SenateSenate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Reject, Discharge and Appoint
2017-05-10HouseHouse Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Reject, Discharge and Appoint
2017-05-10 First Conference Committee Result was to No Report
2017-05-03 First Conference Committee Result was to No Report
2017-04-21SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
2017-04-20HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-04-19HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2017-04-18HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2017-04-17HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2017-04-13HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
2017-04-12HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2017-04-11HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2017-04-10HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2017-04-07HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 04/10/2017 - No Amendments
2017-04-03HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 04/07/2017 - No Amendments
2017-03-28HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 04/03/2017 - No Amendments
2017-03-27HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2017-03-24HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 03/27/2017 - No Amendments
2017-03-20HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2017-03-10HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance
2017-03-09SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-03-08SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2017-03-06SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/08/2017 - No Amendments
2017-03-01SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2017-02-14SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb17-184
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_184_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_184_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_184_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_184_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_184_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017a_184_01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sblt2017a2017-03-01t133908z-sb17-184-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sblt2017a2017-03-01t133908z-sb17-184-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sblt2017a2017-03-01t133908z-sb17-184-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sblt2017a2017-03-01t133908z-sb17-184-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520Senate%2520Journal.pdf#393
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2017a2017-03-20t133400z-sb17-184-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520House%2520Journal.pdf#984
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520Senate%2520Journal.pdf#887
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520House%2520Journal.pdf#1079
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/cc2017a2017-05-10t134800z-sb17-184-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/cc2017a2017-05-10t083315z-sb17-184-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/cc2017a2017-05-10t134800z-sb17-184-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/cc2017a2017-05-10t181100z-sb17-184-0-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback