CO SB183 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-3)
Status: Passed on May 31 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-3)
Status: Passed on May 31 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the distraint sale of a mobile home to collect delinquent property taxes, and, in connection therewith, temporarily suspending the distraint sale of mobile homes, creating a task force on mobile home ownership and taxation, and making an appropriation.
Title
Mobile Home Taxation Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-183 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 24-183, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-183, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer Senate Bill 24-183, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-183 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 24-183, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-183, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer Senate Bill 24-183, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2024-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-30 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-23 | House | House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-04-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government & Housing Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government & Housing |