CO SB182 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School Boards Meeting In Executive Session
Title
School Boards Meeting In Executive Session
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 The motion passed on a vote of 7-5, with one member excused. (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-182, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-182 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-182, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-182 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Considered Senate Adherence - Result was to Recede |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adhere - CCR not produced |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Reconsider |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-30 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-28 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |