CO SB180 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of an eviction legal defense fund, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Eviction Legal Defense Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-180 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-180 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.005) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-180, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-180, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-180, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-180 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-180 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.005) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-180, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-180, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-180, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-27 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-25 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |