CO SB178 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Senate Second Reading Lost with Amendments - Committee, Floor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Senate Second Reading Lost with Amendments - Committee, Floor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Drug-endangered Child Criminal Code
Title
Drug-endangered Child Criminal Code
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Kerr [D] | Sen. Linda Newell [D] | Rep. David Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.003 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-178, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.003 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-178, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Lost with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/23/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |