CO SB177 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-09 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 8/9/2021 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-09 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 8/9/2021 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning restrictions on foreign-influenced money in political campaigns in the state.
Title
Restrict Foreign-influenced Money In Politics
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-177, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-177, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-177, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 8/9/2021 - No Amendments |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/07/2021 - No Amendments |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/05/2021 - No Amendments |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/29/2021 - No Amendments |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |